Born in Böblingen, Germany. 1994 - 1999. Studies of mechanical engineering at the university of applied sciences in Constance, Germany. Focus on production.
Jul 30, 2024 · Since 2018, he has been the CEO of the German mechanical engineering company Manz AG. Previously he was Chief Operating Officer at Manz and held ...
Jun 18, 2024 · Martin Drasch · 1974 Born in Böblingen, Germany · 1994 - 1999 Studies of mechanical engineering at the university of applied sciences in ...
Martin Drasch is Former Chairman-Mgmt Board/CEO at Manz AG. See Martin Drasch's compensation, career history, education, & memberships.
Martin Drasch is currently the Chief Executive Officer at Manz AG. Prior to his current position, he worked at Eisenmann SE as the Vice President-Technology ...
Aug 14, 2024 · Martin Drasch, Vorstandsvorsitzender der Manz AG, wird zum 1. Oktober 2024 der neue Geschäftsführer von Schuler.
The previous CEO Martin Drasch will leave the company at his own request and by best mutual agreement on August 31, 2024. With effect from July 15, 2024 ...
Jul 11, 2024 · The previous CEO Martin Drasch will leave the company at his own request and by best mutual agreement on August 31, 2024.