Experience: Ruger Firearms · Education: United States Military Academy at West Point · Location: New York City Metropolitan Area · 500+ connections on ...
Fólk spyr einnig um
Who is the CEO of Sturm Ruger?
Who owns Ruger company?
Where is Ruger headquarters?
Christopher John Killoy is President/CEO at Sturm Ruger & Co Inc. See Christopher John Killoy's compensation, career history, education, & memberships.
Mr. Killoy was Chief Operating Officer of Ruger from January 1, 2014 to May 9, 2017. Prior to that, he served as Vice President of Sales and Marketing ...
9. apr. 2024 · The estimated Net Worth of Christopher John Killoy is at least $12.3 Million dollars as of 5 April 2024. Mr Killoy owns over 3,724 units of ...
2. ágú. 2024 · * On august 1, entered into an agreement with christopher j. Killoy who will become chief executive officer of company on may 9, 2017. * ...
As President and Chief Executive Officer at STURM RUGER & CO INC, Christopher J. Killoy made $3,380,797 in total compensation.